MD HB102 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a civil action for specified damages may be brought under specified circumstances against an alcoholic beverages licensee or the licensee's employee who sells or furnishes alcoholic beverages to an individual who was visibly under the influence of alcoholic beverages and who negligently drove or attempted to drive a motor vehicle after consuming the alcoholic beverages; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2015-02-11HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-10HouseHearing cancelled
2015-02-11HouseHearing 2/11 at 2:00 p.m.
2015-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback