MD HB102 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-07 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program in Anne Arundel County; requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education, beginning in the 2018-2019 school year, in collaboration with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, to provide awareness for all school-based personnel on human trafficking for 2 years; requiring the Department and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide to the Board specified materials for distribution; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {564839/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-02-21HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-02-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {535565/1 Report Adopted
2017-02-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2017-02-02HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-16HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0102&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0102f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0102t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_53556501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_56483901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0102.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0102_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0102_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,h-0125&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,s-1235&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback