MD HB1022 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to provide a report to the State Department of Education by October 1, 2020 and every 3 years thereafter, on the amount of State, local, and federal funds spent per student for certain students at each school; requiring the Department to submit a certain report to the General Assembly by certain dates; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Spending - Reporting Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2019-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Data
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Data
Demographics
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Students