MD HB1025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Administrator of Elections, or a designee, to investigate a potential violation of certain provisions of law prohibiting certain coordinated expenditures and donations; authorizing the State Administrator, or a designee, to issue a subpoena for the attendance of a witness to testify or for the production of records; requiring the State Administrator to make a finding that the subpoena is necessary to and in furtherance of an investigation for the subpoena to be issued; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-25) (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-25) (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (111-25)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {374935/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (109-25)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1025&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1025f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1025t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1025e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_711_hb1025e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1025_37493501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb1025.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1025_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0581.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1025_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0964.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1218.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback