MD HB1028 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide certain notice in order for the law enforcement agency to designate the person as a criminal gang member or criminal gang associate in a shared gang database; requiring a certain notice to contain certain information; providing that a certain person may submit a certain request regarding criminal gang status; requiring a certain law enforcement agency to provide certain information under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Criminal Gangs - Database (Fair and Accurate Gang Database Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Data
Discipline
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Gangs
Identification
Job Training
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Data
Discipline
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Gangs
Identification
Job Training
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Notices
Petitions
Privacy
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations