MD HB1037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB593
Note: Carry Foward to future SB535
Note: Carry Foward to future SB535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain notice of an additional meeting of a council of unit owners to include certain information under certain circumstances; requiring an additional meeting of a council of unit owners to be held not less than 15 days after the initial properly called meeting; requiring a certain notice of an additional meeting of the council of unit owners to be delivered, mailed, or emailed to each unit owner, advertised in a local newspaper, or posted on the homepage of the website if the condominium has a website; etc.
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-3) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {130017/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1037 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
HB1037 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
HB1037 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Advertising
Communications
Condominiums
Homeowners Associations
internet
Notices
Open Government
Postal Service
Real Property
Signs and Billboards
Voting
Communications
Condominiums
Homeowners Associations
internet
Notices
Open Government
Postal Service
Real Property
Signs and Billboards
Voting