MD HB1038 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified lenders, credit grantors, and servicers of loans from including, for a period of 1 year after the determination is made, increases in the amount of escrow payments in calculating the amount of interest or any fee due under specified residential mortgage loans under specified circumstances; authorizing a lender, a credit grantor, or a servicer of a loan to charge interest to a borrower on specified funds under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Residential Mortgage Loans - Escrow Amounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (121-16) | |
2011-04-09 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (113-23) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Consumer Protection
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Financial Institutions
Interest
Loans
Mortgages
Notices
Savings and Loan Associations
Consumer Protection
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Financial Institutions
Interest
Loans
Mortgages
Notices
Savings and Loan Associations