MD HB1045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the planning commissions for certain local jurisdictions to include a housing element in the comprehensive plan for their respective jurisdictions; providing that the contents of the housing element in certain comprehensive plans include goals, objectives, policies, plans, and standards and address the need for affordable housing within a county, including workforce housing and low-income housing; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Use - Comprehensive Plans - Housing Element

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-41) (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (94-41)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {410614/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback