MD HB1046 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified timing requirements for filing an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property; authorizing the Office of Administrative Hearings to hold a prehearing conference before a prefile mediation session and before a postfile mediation session; and altering the rules of procedure for contested cases of the Office of Administrative Hearings that govern a foreclosure mediation on residential property.
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783328/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (45-90) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783328/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (45-90) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {783328/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (45-90) |
2017-03-07 | House | Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |