MD HB1047 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Admission Practices at Public Senior Higher Education Institutions; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain admission practices of Maryland public senior higher education institutions that relate to admission of in-State versus out-of-State students; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Admission Practices at Public Senior Higher Education Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interstate Affairs
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interstate Affairs
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset