MD HB105 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement that a specified committee adopt an apportionment formula for Program Open Space funds to require the Department of Natural Resources in consultation with a specified committee to adopt the apportionment formula; altering the membership of the committee; repealing the authority of the committee to reallocate Program Open Space funds; repealing a requirement that before adopting an apportionment formula the committee provide notification and opportunity for a hearing; etc.
Title
Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes
Hearings
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes