MD HB105 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Community Development Administration of the Department of Housing and Community Development to prepare a certain report on compliance monitoring for low-income housing tax credits and certain multifamily rental assistance programs by September 1 each year; requiring certain reports to include certain information, comments, and feedback; and requiring the Department to maintain on its website copies of certain reports, certain instructions, and a certain data dashboard.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Community Development Administration – Compliance Monitoring Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-22) |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Communications
Community Development
Data
Disclosure
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Welfare
Community Development
Data
Disclosure
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Tax Credits
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Welfare
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |