MD HB1052 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission; expressing the legislative intent that the Field Enforcement Division (FED) in the Office of the Comptroller be transferred to the Commission by July 1, 2020; establishing certain powers and duties for the Commission in addition to those transferred from the Comptroller's office; requiring the Commission to conduct certain studies related to the alcohol and tobacco industries and to develop certain best practices; requiring the Governor to appoint an Executive Director of the Commission; etc.
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Overridden (98-39) (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-37) (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-15) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {783125/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-29) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-36) (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-37) (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-15) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {783125/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-29) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-36) (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Veto overridden (30-16) |
2019-03-28 | House | Veto overridden (98-39) |
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-37) |
2019-03-20 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-15) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783125/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-29) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {763925/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {584737/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {584737/1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-36) |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {853591/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annotated Code of Maryland
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Cigarettes
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Disclosure
Equipment
Ethics
Fuel
Fuel Tax
Governor
Health
Hearings
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Smoking
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Summonses
Tobacco
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annotated Code of Maryland
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Cigarettes
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Disclosure
Equipment
Ethics
Fuel
Fuel Tax
Governor
Health
Hearings
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Labeling
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Smoking
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Summonses
Tobacco
Work, Labor and Employment