MD HB1057 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring holders of certain retail alcoholic beverages licenses and certain designated employees to complete training in an approved alcohol awareness program; requiring individuals who are employed to sell or serve alcoholic beverages to be certified by an approved alcohol awareness program; requiring holders of retail alcoholic beverages licenses to ensure that an individual who is certified is on the licensed premises during the hours in which alcoholic beverages may be sold or served; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Program Certification Requirements - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823695/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Certifications
Counties
Education
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Certifications
Counties
Education
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Time