MD HB1057 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to work with the historically black colleges and universities (HBCUs) in the State to approve and prioritize certain academic programs and to promote the overall competitiveness of the HBCUs; requiring the Governor, in fiscal years 2022 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget certain funds for certain HBCUs to be used for a specific purpose; requiring that certain funds become part of the base funds for certain HBCUs; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Comparability and Competitiveness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Budgets
Curriculum
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Appropriations
Budgets
Curriculum
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 206.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 12 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 14 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |