MD HB106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2030, the termination date of a certain environmental surcharge on electrical energy distributed to retail electric customers in the State.
Title
Environmental Trust Fund - Surcharge Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-19) (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-19) (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-19) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223395/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2019-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Fees
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Fees
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Utility Regulation