MD HB1061 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1, 2017, in consultation with disability advocacy groups, to update specified guidelines to accommodate, safeguard, and evacuate students, staff, and visitors with disabilities on public school grounds; requiring each local school system, on or before July, 2018, to update the local school system's emergency plan based on a specified update of the Department's guidelines and regulations; etc.
Title
Education - Emergency and Evacuation Plans - Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Del. James Tarlau [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {385369/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Disabilities
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset