MD HB1062 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class M-G beer, wine, and liquor license for use at a municipal golf course in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue the license to a manager of a municipal golf course; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption on certain land and facilities used for golfing purposes; authorizing the license holder to designate an agent for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Municipal Golf Course License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 416 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383097/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Public Buildings and Facilities
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Sports and Recreation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Public Buildings and Facilities
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Sports and Recreation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1009.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |