MD HB1064 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Board of Sign Language Interpreters in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain individuals; providing for the composition of the Board and the appointment, terms, qualifications, expenses, and removal of the Board members; providing for the chair and the term of the chair of the Board; establishing that a majority of members then serving is a quorum; etc.
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorneys
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counselors
Courts
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Equipment
Fees
Governor
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Mental and Behavioral Health
Psychologists
Video
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Counselors
Courts
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Equipment
Fees
Governor
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language
Licenses
Long-Term Care
Mental and Behavioral Health
Psychologists
Video