MD HB1065 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a framework for a court to oversee the management and disposition of commercial property subject to receivership; providing standards and guidelines for the appointment, authority, and termination of a receiver over receivership property; establishing duties that may be required of a receiver; establishing a procedure for the transfer of receivership property; repealing certain provisions of law regarding an assignee for the benefit of creditors; etc.
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {253391/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Appeals
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Courts
Credit
Damages
District of Columbia
Hearings
Mortgages
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Real Property
Records
Spouses
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Courts
Credit
Damages
District of Columbia
Hearings
Mortgages
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Real Property
Records
Spouses