MD HB107 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Baltimore City to recover the costs of implementing and administering a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, a school bus monitoring camera, or a vehicle height monitoring system; requiring Baltimore City, after recovering costs, to spend the remaining balance of fines collected from the monitoring systems solely on public safety or transportation infrastructure improvements consistent with the purpose and goals of the Complete Streets Program and the Complete Streets Transportation System; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Complete Streets Program Funding - Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
Sponsors
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Brooke Lierman [D] |
Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Melissa Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310410/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB107 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Baltimore City
Comptroller
Electronic Surveillance
Fines
Highways
Revenue and Taxes
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Treasurers
Comptroller
Electronic Surveillance
Fines
Highways
Revenue and Taxes
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |