MD HB1074 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring public institutions of higher education to grant priority registration for courses to certain currently serving members and veterans of the armed forces of the United States; providing that a certain course registration priority applies only within 15 years after an eligible service member was on active duty; providing that a certain course registration priority does not apply to an eligible service member after 4 academic years; requiring public institutions of higher education to adopt certain policies; etc.
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Priority Registration for Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {284862/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |