MD HB1074 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the categories of individuals who are authorized to be employed or contracted to provide education services for a 10-month or 2-month period with a salary commensurate with the period of employment; extending the date for a certain workgroup to convene and analyze the results of the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to January 1, 2020; charging the workgroup with identifying reforms highlighted by the pilot program and academic research on best practices on education in institutional settings; etc.
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-25) (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-25) |
2019-03-18 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {665863/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Curriculum
Education
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Curriculum
Education
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth