MD HB1075 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a housing authority established to undertake specified housing projects to establish a specified Web site; requiring the Web site to contain specified information related to the membership, operation, and budget of the authority; providing that the Housing Authority of Baltimore City is a Baltimore City agency for purposes of specified procurement regulations issued by the Board of Estimates of Baltimore City; etc.
Title
Housing Authorities - Transparency and Baltimore Authority Bidding Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Housing
Procurement
Rules and Regulations
Baltimore City
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Housing
Procurement
Rules and Regulations