MD HB1075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certain procurement preference for a nonprofit entity in which at least 60% of the employees are disabled; renaming the Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program to be the Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers; requiring the Committee to ensure that supplies and services provided by certain nonprofit entities create certain work opportunities; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Preferences - Nonprofits
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] | Del. Angela Angel [D] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] |
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Names
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment