MD HB1077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions regarding a prohibition on the sale or provision of alcoholic beverages within an election district or precinct of Talbot County on the day of a general, special, or primary election during the hours when the polls are open.
Title
Talbot County - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |