MD HB1080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying a certain time frame within which a certain franchisor is required to notify a franchisee of an intention to terminate or refuse to renew a beer franchise agreement; exempting certain franchisors from a prohibition against terminating or refusing to continue to renew a beer franchise agreement without good cause under certain circumstances; providing for the submission of a certain matter to arbitration and for its application and enforcement in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseFloor Amendment {363323/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {813395/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1080&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1080f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1080t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_379_hb1080t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1080_36332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1080_81339501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb1080.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1080_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0704.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1080_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0785.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback