MD HB1081 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision of law that requires a certified public accountant firm to hold a permit issued by the State Board of Public Accountancy if the firm performs certain attest services for a client with a home office in this State; and authorizing a certain firm that does not have an office in this State to perform certain attest services for a certain client in this State without a permit issued by the Board under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {423292/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback