MD HB1084 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying, in specified provisions of law relating to domestic violence, that reasonable corporal punishment of a child does not include specified actions.
Title
Domestic Violence - Reasonable Corporal Punishment - Limitations
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] |
Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Del. Mary Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1084.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1084f.pdf |