MD HB1084 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 424
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a certain assignment of rents or assignment of leases for security purposes from certain requirements related to recordation; and authorizing a certain assignment of rents or assignment of leases for security purposes prepared by an attorney or one of the parties named in the instrument to be recorded without a certain certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property – Recordation of Deeds – Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 424
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB154 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 423

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property3104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback