MD HB109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt by regulation the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code as the Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards; requiring the Department to adopt each subsequent version of the Standards within 18 months after the Standards are issued; requiring the Department to take certain actions before adopting each version of the Standards; requiring the Department to consult with the Maryland Department of Health on the implementation of the Standards; etc.
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards – Adoption
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-36) |
2021-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {660712/1 Adopted |
2021-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB109 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB254 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB254 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Codes
Counties
Fees
Health, Department of
Hearings
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Public Safety
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Swimming Pools
Codes
Counties
Fees
Health, Department of
Hearings
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Public Safety
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Swimming Pools
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |