MD HB1090 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring that the General Assembly finds that 9-1-1 specialists are key members of the team of public safety personnel; repealing references to the term "9-1-1 public safety telecommunicator" and substituting references to the term "9-1-1 specialist" in certain provisions authorizing a certain property tax credit; etc.
Title
9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {116586/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Disabilities
Emergencies
Exemptions
Health
Income Tax
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Property Tax
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Workers' Compensation
Emergencies
Exemptions
Health
Income Tax
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Property Tax
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Workers' Compensation