MD HB1093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Including income from certain death benefits within a certain subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (The Jonathan Porto Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380
2019-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateSpecial Order until 4/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {399037/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {165968/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1093&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1093f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1093t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1093e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_380_hb1093e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1093_16596801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1093_39903701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1093.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1093_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0387.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1093_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1116.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1356.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback