MD HB1098 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the contents of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; authorizing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, in consultation with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner and as approved by the Board of Trustees of the Exchange, to submit a waiver under certain provisions of federal law as to allow the State to administer certain tax credit assistance to small businesses; and requiring the Exchange to determine whether the State needs a waiver to distribute certain tax credit assistance on a monthly basis to certain eligible employers.
Title
Health Insurance - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business Tax Credit Subsidy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401 |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {196483/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Aid
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
State Aid
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment