MD HB11 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing references to "emotional disturbance" to "emotional disability"; providing that specified documents may not be used until the use of specified other documents; providing nothing in the Act is intended to result in a reduction of federal funds available to the State; etc.
Title
Student Stigma Act
Sponsors
Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Daniel Riley [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] | Del. Richard Sossi [R] | Del. John Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (139-1) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-29 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2009-08-06 | Pre-filed |