MD HB11 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the prosecution of a misdemeanor offense of the prohibition against a specified person in a position of authority engaging in a sexual act or sexual contact with a minor, under specified circumstances, be instituted within 3 years after the offense was committed; prohibiting a specified person in a position of authority who is at least 6 years older than the victim from engaging in sexual contact or a sexual act while the minor is enrolled or participating in a specified institution, program, or activity; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2012-01-12 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-11-15 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Camps
Child Care
Churches
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Statutes of Limitation
Students
Teachers
Child Care
Churches
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Sports and Recreation
Statutes of Limitation
Students
Teachers
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0011.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0011f.pdf |