MD HB11 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing a diesel-powered motor vehicle to emit clearly visible smoke, soot, or other exhaust emissions onto another person or motor vehicle; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-30) (Y: 94 N: 30 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-30) (Y: 94 N: 30 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-30) |
2017-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-08-23 | House | Pre-filed |