MD HB11 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sale of goods and services of Maryland Correctional Enterprises on the open market to an individual employed by the State government.
Title
Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Goods and Services - Sales to Individuals Employed by the State Government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-01-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-07-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Retail Sales
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Retail Sales
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials