MD HB11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that, pending a determination by a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child whether to transfer its jurisdiction to the juvenile court, provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile records apply to all police records and court records concerning the child from the time of the child's arrest until a certain event occurs; establishing that, if a case is transferred to the juvenile court, certain provisions of law relating to confidentiality of juvenile records continue to apply; etc.
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-19) (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-19) (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378677/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {378677/1 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-19) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {532411/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-11-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Arrests
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Expungement
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Photography
Prisoners
Privacy
Records
Video
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Expungement
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Photography
Prisoners
Privacy
Records
Video