MD HB1104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to take action against a clinical professional counselor only if the Board discusses the proposed action with a Board member who is a licensed clinical professional counselor and who votes, either in the affirmative or negative, on the proposed action; repealing the requirement that the credit hours or educational requirements completed by certain applicants to be licensed by the Board be accredited by the American Art Therapy Association; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists – Licensure, Disciplinary Action, Criminal History Records Checks, and Trainee Status – Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {456883/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback