MD HB1110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the size of the safety zone to 50 yards for archery hunters in Washington County within which archery hunting may not take place except under certain circumstances; and requiring that an archery hunter in Washington County be in an elevated position when hunting any wild bird or mammal within 50 to 100 yards of certain buildings.
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-3) (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-3) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Boundaries
Communications
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Safety
Time
Washington County
Weapons
Zoning and Planning
Birds
Boundaries
Communications
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Safety
Time
Washington County
Weapons
Zoning and Planning