MD HB1111 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of Carroll County to adjust the salary of the State's Attorney for Carroll County to include a specified cost- of-living adjustment under specified circumstances; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the State's Attorney for Carroll County during a specified term in office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
2010-03-05 Hearing cancelled
2010-02-19 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-17 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback