MD HB1111 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting owners, employees, and operators of tanning facilities from allowing minors to use specified tanning devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-07 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2011-02-18 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-18 Hearing cancelled
2011-02-14 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback