MD HB1111 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a video lottery employee who works for a video lottery operation licensee and is an adult to enter and remain in an area within a video lottery facility designated for table game or video lottery terminal activities if the video lottery employee is working; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Facility - Areas Prohibited to Individuals Under the Age of 21 Years - Employee Exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117
2015-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2015-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-23SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2015-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed (138-1)
2015-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-20HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-20HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2015-03-17HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-20HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2015-02-18HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback