MD HB1111 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a notary public to perform notarial acts electronically; requiring a specified notary public to register with the Secretary of State before performing specified electronic notarizations; requiring the Secretary to develop a specified registration form for an electronic notary; establishing a system of electronic notarization for specified electronic documents; authorizing an electronic notary to perform a remote notarization if the notary obtains specified proof of identity; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-15HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2016-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-24HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback