MD HB1111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation by July 1 of each year a deer firearms season applicable the Eastern Shore that at a minimum includes specified time periods.
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Animals
Caroline County
Cecil County
Dorchester County
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Kent County
Natural Resources, Department of
Queen Anne's County
Rules and Regulations
Somerset County
Sunset
Talbot County
Time
Wicomico County
Worcester County
Caroline County
Cecil County
Dorchester County
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Kent County
Natural Resources, Department of
Queen Anne's County
Rules and Regulations
Somerset County
Sunset
Talbot County
Time
Wicomico County
Worcester County