MD HB1111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public institution of higher education to require a student health center to provide during the regular hours of operation of the student health center on-site access to certain emergency contraception and contraceptive counseling or referrals for contraceptive counseling to other qualified health care providers; requiring a public institution of higher education to ensure the availability of certain emergency contraception at all times, such as through vending machines or other similar devices; etc.
Title
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2018-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Birth Control
Counselors
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities
Higher Education
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Schools
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Vending Machines
Counselors
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Facilities
Higher Education
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Schools
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Vending Machines