MD HB1111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the authorization for the Secretary of State Police to require certain training; requiring a certain candidate for a commission as a special police officer to complete at least 80 hours of instruction; exempting a certain candidate for commission as a special police officer from completing certain instruction under certain circumstances; and requiring an applicant for the renewal of a commission as a special police officer to receive certain training before applying for renewal.
Title
Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {762815/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Education
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
State Police, Department of
Time
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
State Police, Department of
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |