MD HB1117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to develop a certain plan extending Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) service, to make certain recommendations, and to revise a certain plan; and requiring the Administration to report its recommendations and plans to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration - Extension of MARC Service - Plans and Report

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback