MD HB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Comptroller, when setting the annual interest rate for tax deficiencies and refunds, round the interest rate to the nearest whole number.
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds - Rounding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {929438/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |